CA AB947 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11370.1 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 12022 of the Penal Code, relating to controlled substances.
Title
Controlled substances: firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 947 CHAVEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 947 CHAVEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1449.) |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11370.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 12022 | Amended Code | Citation Text |