CA AB943 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 3.6 (commencing with Section 1024.5) to Part 2 of Division 2 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment: credit reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-09 - Assembly - AB 943 MENDOZA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB943 Mendoza By Oropeza (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - AB 943 MENDOZA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB943 Mendoza By Oropeza (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - AB 943 MENDOZA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-14 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2009-10-26 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2009-10-11 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2009-09-29 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2009-09-09 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 3191.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 49. Noes 29. Page 3193.) | |
2009-09-08 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-09-03 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2176.) | |
2009-08-25 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-24 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (August 24). | |
2009-08-17 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-07-09 | Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-08 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 7). | |
2009-07-01 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |
2009-06-29 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-26 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 25). | |
2009-06-22 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD. | |
2009-05-28 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 30. Page 1719.) | |
2009-05-26 | Action rescinded and record expunged whereby a final roll call vote was taken. | |
2009-05-18 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-14 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 13). | |
2009-04-28 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 27). | |
2009-04-23 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). | |
2009-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2009-04-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. | |
2009-02-27 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time. To print. |