CA AB940 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 341, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1203, 1209, 1260, 1264, and 1300 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clinical laboratories.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-02 - Assembly - AB 940 RIDLEY-THOMAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB940 Ridley-Thomas By Bates (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 940 RIDLEY-THOMAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 341, Statutes of 2015.
2015-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2015-09-15AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2015-09-02AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2772.).
2015-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2015-08-31SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2297.).
2015-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-20SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2015-08-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-17SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2015-07-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-07-08SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2015-07-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-06-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29).
2015-06-11SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2015-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1721.)
2015-05-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-06AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2015-04-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2015-04-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-07AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2015-03-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2015-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2015-03-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2015-02-27AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
2015-02-26AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_940&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0901-0950/ab_940_bill_20150226_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0901-0950/ab_940_bill_20150323_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0901-0950/ab_940_bill_20150423_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0901-0950/ab_940_bill_20150701_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0901-0950/ab_940_bill_20150714_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0901-0950/ab_940_bill_20150820_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0901-0950/ab_940_bill_20150904_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0901-0950/ab_940_bill_20150928_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0901-0950/ab_940_vote_20150421_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0901-0950/ab_940_vote_20150528_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0901-0950/ab_940_vote_20150601_0221PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0901-0950/ab_940_vote_20150629_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0901-0950/ab_940_vote_20150831_0340PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0901-0950/ab_940_vote_20150902_1025AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback