CA AB938 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 124, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 124, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2837.103 and 17525 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 1689.7, 1788.102, and 1788.105 of, and to amend and renumber Section 1179.04.5 of, the Civil Code, to amend Sections 488.375, 488.405, 492.010, 703.140, 704.060, 708.310, 917.7, 1010.6, and 2031.060 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Sections 8209, 17463.7, 43505, 47612.7, 47653, 52064, 56345, 56836.06, and 56836.142 of the Education Code, to amend Section 2700 of the Elections Code, to amend Sections 3044, 3118, and 7630 of the Family Code, to amend Section 78002 of the Food and Agricultural Code, to amend Section 12893.1 of, and to amend and renumber Section 13975.2 of, the Government Code, to amend Section 105206 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 1205 of the Labor Code, to amend Sections 236.1 and 851.7 of the Penal Code, to amend Sections 1825 and 3420 of the Public Utilities Code, to amend Section 17020.12 of, and to amend and renumber the heading of Article 26 (commencing with Section 18914) of Chapter 3 of Part 10.2 of Division 2 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend Sections 10202, 10203, 10205, and 10206 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, to amend Section 1 of Chapter 115 of the Statutes of 2020, and to amend Section 26 of Chapter 264 of the Statutes of 2020, relating to the maintenance of the codes.
Title
Maintenance of the codes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB938 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Assembly - AB 938 Davies Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Assembly - AB 938 Davies Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 124, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2021-07-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1907.). |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1717.) (June 29). |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 863.) |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 23). |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |