CA AB912 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 3.7 (commencing with Section 11367) to Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to small business.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small business: California Small Business Regulatory Fairness Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2017-04-05AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 28).
2017-03-02AssemblyReferred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and A. & A.R.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code11367New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback