CA AB908 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 64, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 64, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 35160.5 and 49132 of, and to add Article 8 (commencing with Section 49200) to Chapter 7 of Part 27 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, the Education Code, relating to pupils, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Pupils: extracurricular activities: work permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 908 O'Donnell Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB908 O'Donnell Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 908 O'Donnell Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB908 O'Donnell Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 908 O'Donnell Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 64, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5319.). |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4373.). |
2020-08-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-07-31 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 29). |
2020-07-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3894.) |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23). |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 35160.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49132 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49200 | New Code | See Bill Text |