CA AB907 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1367.38 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10123.38 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Coverage for PANDAS and PANS.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-13 - Assembly - AB 907 Lowenthal Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB907 Lowenthal By Gonzalez (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 907 Lowenthal Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB907 Lowenthal By Gonzalez (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 907 Lowenthal Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2023-10-07 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 3366.). |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2619.). |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-07-10 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2023-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 2051.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (May 18). |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.38 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.38 | New Code | See Bill Text |