CA AB904 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-05 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-05 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 2 (commencing with Section 65200) to Chapter 3 of Division 1 of Title 7 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: parking spaces: minimum requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-26 - Assembly - AB 904 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-05 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-06-27 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-06-20 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-06-14 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-06-13 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-06-12 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | |
2012-02-16 | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | |
2012-01-26 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-01-26 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3596.) | |
2012-01-23 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-01-19 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 19). | |
2012-01-12 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-01-11 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-18 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-05-11 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-10 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |
2011-04-25 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2011-04-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-04 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 381.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |