CA AB889 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-13 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-13 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 8.1 (commencing with Section 12285) to Chapter 3 of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to business entities.
Title
Business entities: landlords: reporting requirements.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-13 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [07-14-2021]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - AB 889 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 18 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - AB 889 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 18 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-13 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2021-06-18 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-03 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S., L., P.E. & R. and GOV. & F. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 18. Page 1538.) |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 5). |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12285 | New Code | See Bill Text |