CA AB88 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-09-12 - Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 25. Noes 4. Page 2453.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Negrete McLeod. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2453.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-09-12 - Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 25. Noes 4. Page 2453.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Negrete McLeod. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2453.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to state employees, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
State employees: memoranda of understanding.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2009-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB88 Committee on P.E.,R.& S.S.(Hernan Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Assembly - AB 88 DAVIS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Assembly - AB 88 DAVIS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-12 | Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 25. Noes 4. Page 2453.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Negrete McLeod. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2453.) | |
2009-09-10 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-09-09 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. | |
2009-09-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-08-27 | In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file. | |
2009-08-25 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 24). | |
2009-08-20 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2009-06-18 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2009-06-04 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-03 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 29. Page 2046.) | |
2009-06-02 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-01 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28). | |
2009-05-06 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 22). | |
2009-02-05 | Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. | |
2009-01-06 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 5. | |
2009-01-05 | Read first time. To print. |