CA AB85 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-15 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-15 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11121 of the Government Code, relating to state government, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Open meetings.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB85 Wilk By Vidak (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 85 WILK Third Reading Urgency (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 85 WILK Third Reading Urgency (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-15 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2015-09-28 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2288.). |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 17). |
2015-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1698.). |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 8). |
2015-01-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 6. |
2015-01-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |