CA AB826 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 31461.7 to the Government Code, relating to county employees’ retirement.
Title
County Employees Retirement Law of 1937: compensation and compensation earnable.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 826 Irwin Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB826 Irwin By Gonzalez (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 826 Bennett Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB826 Irwin By Gonzalez (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 826 Bennett Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 10.). |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 31). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 60. Noes 16.) |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 4954.). |
2022-08-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-03 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-03 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Limón. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 12). |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 9. Page 1649.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 20). |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 14). |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 31461.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |