CA AB819 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 97, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 97, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 21080.4, 21082.1, 21091, 21092, 21092.2, 21092.3, 21108, 21152, and 21161 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: notices and documents: electronic filing and posting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-28 - Assembly - AB 819 Levine Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB819 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - AB 819 Levine Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB819 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - AB 819 Levine Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 97, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2131.). |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1634.). |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1154.) |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14). |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 24). |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21080.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21082.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21091 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21092 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21092.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21092.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21161 | Amended Code | Citation Text |