CA AB816 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 396, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 50676 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to homelessness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homelessness: Housing Trust Fund: housing projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-10 - Assembly - AB 816 Chiu Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB816 Chiu et al. By Wiener (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 816 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 396, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-29 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-22 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2021-09-10AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 14.).
2021-09-10AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (September 10).
2021-09-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2021-09-01AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 16.)
2021-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 7.).
2021-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-23SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-07-16SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2021-06-23SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
2021-06-09 Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Coms. on HOUSING, HUMAN S. and JUD.
2021-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 15.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 20).
2021-05-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-04AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-05-03AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 29).
2021-02-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2021-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2021-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code50676Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback