CA AB815 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-16 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 53300 of the Education Code, relating to school intervention.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School intervention: parent empowerment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-01-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-16AssemblyFrom committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
2014-01-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
2013-04-17AssemblyIn committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
2013-04-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2013-04-10AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2013-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2013-03-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2013-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2013-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code52372.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code53300Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback