CA AB797 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 473, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 473, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2861, 2863, 2864, 2865, 2866, 2867, and 2867.3 of, to amend the heading of Article 2 (commencing with Section 2860) of Chapter 9 of Part 2 of Division 1 of, to amend and renumber Section 2862 of, to repeal Sections 2860 and 2867.2 of, and to repeal and add Section 2867.4 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Solar thermal systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Assembly - AB 797 IRWIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB797 Irwin By Stern (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 797 IRWIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB797 Irwin By Stern (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 797 IRWIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 473, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 3375.). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.) |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 2756.). |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2017-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 6). |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 1540.) |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 10). |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (April 19). |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2860 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2861 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2863 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2864 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2865 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2866 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2867 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2867.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2867.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2867.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |