CA AB777 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 16180 and 16183 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 20585 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Property tax postponement.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Asm. Jim Patterson [R] | Sen. Ling Ling Chang [R] | Asm. Megan Dahle [R] |
Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Asm. Randy Voepel [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16180 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 16183 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 20585 | Amended Code | Citation Text |