CA AB773 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 587, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 587, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21101 of the Vehicle Code, relating to streets.
Title
Street closures and designations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-30 - Assembly - AB 773 Nazarian Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB773 Nazarian By Wiener (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - AB 773 Nazarian Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB773 Nazarian By Wiener (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - AB 773 Nazarian Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 587, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-02 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2562.). |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 5. Page 2091.). |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (July 13). |
2021-07-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1405.) |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 5). |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 21101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |