CA AB757 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-15 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 1246.7 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Healing arts: clinical laboratories.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-31 - Assembly - AB 757 GOMEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB757 Gomez By Hernandez (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 757 GOMEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-15 Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
2015-09-30 Vetoed by Governor.
2015-09-09AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2015-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2667.).
2015-08-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2015-08-24SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2147.).
2015-07-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-07-13SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2015-06-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-06-22SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2015-06-15SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2015-06-04SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2015-05-22SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1562.)
2015-05-14AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2015-05-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13).
2015-05-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-30AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2015-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 28).
2015-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2015-03-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2015-02-26AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
2015-02-25AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code1246.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_757&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0751-0800/ab_757_bill_20150225_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0751-0800/ab_757_bill_20150326_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0751-0800/ab_757_bill_20150430_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0751-0800/ab_757_bill_20150622_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0751-0800/ab_757_bill_20150902_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0751-0800/ab_757_vote_20150428_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0751-0800/ab_757_vote_20150513_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0751-0800/ab_757_vote_20150522_1037AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0751-0800/ab_757_vote_20150629_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0751-0800/ab_757_vote_20150824_0323PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0751-0800/ab_757_vote_20150831_1222PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback