CA AB740 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 16520, 16730, and 27590 of, and to add Sections 27575, 27580, and 27585 to, the Penal Code, and to amend Section 8103 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms.
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 16520 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 16730 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27575 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 27580 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 27585 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 27590 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 29805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |