CA AB711 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 179, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 179, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 49070 of, and to add Section 49062.5 to, the Education Code, relating to pupil records.
Title
Pupil records: name and gender changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-15 - Assembly - AB 711 Chiu Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB711 Chiu et al. By Durazo (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 711 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB711 Chiu et al. By Durazo (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 711 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 179, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-08-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 2720.). |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 2140.). |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 1765.) |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (May 8). |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49062.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 49070 | Amended Code | Citation Text |