CA AB675 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 333, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 333, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1936.05 of, to amend and repeal Section 1936 of, and to repeal Sections 1936.01 and 1936.015 of, the Civil Code, relating to rental vehicles.
Title
Rental vehicles: advertising and quotes: charges.
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-01 - Assembly - AB 675 ALEJO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB675 Alejo By Jackson (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB675 Alejo By Jackson (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB675 Alejo By Jackson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Assembly - AB 675 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB675 Alejo By Jackson (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB675 Alejo By Jackson (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB675 Alejo By Jackson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Assembly - AB 675 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 333, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2727.). |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2200.). |
2015-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2156.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Allen. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 27. Noes 0. Page 2158.) |
2015-08-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). |
2015-07-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 1256.) |
2015-05-01 | Assembly | Measure version as amended on April 30 corrected. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1215.) |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 14). |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1936 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1936.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1936.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |