CA AB659 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 51226.3 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Pupil instruction: Armenian Genocide.
Sponsors
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D] | Asm. K H Achadjian [R] | Asm. Steve Fox [D] | Asm. Mike Gatto [D] |
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] | Sen. Mark Wyland [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-29 - Assembly - AB 659 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3719.) |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2014-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 1620 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51226.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8006 | Amended Code | Citation Text |