CA AB631 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 727, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 727, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 23039 and 24045.7 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control: licenses: nonprofit cultural film exhibition companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-24 - Assembly - AB 631 Bloom Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB631 Bloom et al. By Portantino (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Assembly - AB 631 Bloom Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB631 Bloom et al. By Portantino (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Assembly - AB 631 Bloom Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 727, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5003.). |
2022-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-16 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3432.) |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Bloom. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Bloom. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23039 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 24045.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |