CA AB623 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 16000 and 38750 of, and to add Section 2407.5 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to autonomous vehicles.
Title
Autonomous vehicles: accident and incident reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 623 RODRIGUEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Communications and Conveyance] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 623 RODRIGUEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Communications and Conveyance] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1824.) |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and C. & C. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 16000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 2407.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 38750 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 38752 | New Code | See Bill Text |