CA AB61 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 71, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 71, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, add, and repeal Section 22508.5 of the Vehicle Code, relating to parking meters.
Title
Parking: parking meters.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gatto [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-07-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB61 Gatto By DeSaulnier (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 61 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 61 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 71, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-08-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:45 p.m. |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 1654.). |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1454.) |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2013-01-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-01-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. |
2013-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 22508.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |