CA AB599 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 300, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1270 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to clinical laboratories.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clinical laboratories: cytotechnologists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-02 - Assembly - AB 599 BONILLA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB599 Bonilla By Hill (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Assembly - AB 599 BONILLA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-21 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 300, Statutes of 2015.
2015-09-21 Approved by the Governor.
2015-09-14AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2015-09-02AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2795.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2809.).
2015-09-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2015-09-01SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2333.).
2015-08-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2015-07-02SenateOrdered to third reading.
2015-07-01SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2015-06-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-06-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22).
2015-06-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-05-28SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2015-05-14SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2015-04-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-04-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1223.)
2015-04-23AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2015-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22).
2015-04-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2015-04-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2015-03-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2015-02-25AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
2015-02-24AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code1270Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_599&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0551-0600/ab_599_bill_20150224_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0551-0600/ab_599_bill_20150406_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0551-0600/ab_599_bill_20150528_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0551-0600/ab_599_bill_20150824_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0551-0600/ab_599_bill_20150904_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0551-0600/ab_599_bill_20150921_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0551-0600/ab_599_vote_20150414_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0551-0600/ab_599_vote_20150422_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0551-0600/ab_599_vote_20150430_0939AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0551-0600/ab_599_vote_20150608_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0551-0600/ab_599_vote_20150622_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0551-0600/ab_599_vote_20150901_1045AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0551-0600/ab_599_vote_20150902_0132PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback