CA AB569 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 661, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 661, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11003.4 and 11013.1 of, and to add Section 11013.6 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 5100 of the Civil Code, relating to land use.
Title
Real property: divided lands.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-14 - Assembly - AB 569 CHAU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB569 Chau By Torres (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Assembly - AB 569 CHAU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB569 Chau By Torres (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Assembly - AB 569 CHAU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 661, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6038.). |
2014-08-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4418.). |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 24). |
2014-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3727.) |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 23). Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-01-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2013-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 11003.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 11013.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 11013.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 5100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12463.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53890 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53891 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53892 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53895.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 33080 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 33080.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 33080.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 33080.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 33080.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 33080.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 33080.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 33080.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |