CA AB564 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 500, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 500, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4677, to amend, repeal, and add Section 4784 of, and to repeal Section 4782 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services.
Title
Regional centers: parental fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-09 - Assembly - AB 564 EGGMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB564 Eggman By McGuire (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 564 EGGMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB564 Eggman By McGuire (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 564 EGGMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 500, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2990.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3015.). |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2582.). |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 14). |
2015-07-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1816.) |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4677 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4784 | Amended Code | Citation Text |