CA AB560 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 429, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 468 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to union organizing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public utilities: unionization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-05 - Assembly - AB 560 Santiago Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB560 Santiago et al. By Hill (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor, Public Employment and Retirement ] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 560 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Employment] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-02 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 429, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-02 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-05AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 3017.).
2019-09-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 2440.).
2019-07-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-08SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-20SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2019-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2019-05-22SenateReferred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and L., P.E. & R.
2019-05-14SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-13AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 4. Page 1627.)
2019-05-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (May 8).
2019-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2019-03-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2019-03-07AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-07AssemblyReferred to Coms. on U. & E. and L. & E.
2019-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2019-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code468New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback