CA AB559 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 5005.2 and 32539 to the Public Resources Code, relating to state parks.
Title
Millerton Lake State Recreation Area: acquisition of land.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 559 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3891.) |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 23). |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 32539 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 5005.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |