CA AB555 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8210, 8211, and 8242 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 8244 of, the Education Code, relating to preschool.
Title
California state preschool programs: reimbursement amounts: adjustment factors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 555 Juan Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 555 Juan Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2023-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2056.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.) |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 28). |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and ED. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2023-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 8210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8211 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8242 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8244 | Amended Code | Citation Text |