CA AB55 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14129.3 of, and to add Section 14105.198 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: workforce adjustment for ground ambulance transports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-12-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 5. |
2022-12-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14105.198 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14129.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |