CA AB546 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 200, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 200, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 832 of the Penal Code, relating to peace officers.
Title
Peace officers: basic training requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-16 - Assembly - AB 546 GONZALEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB546 Gonzalez By Glazer (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Assembly - AB 546 GONZALEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB546 Gonzalez By Glazer (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Assembly - AB 546 GONZALEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 200, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-08-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-08-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2414.). |
2015-07-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-07-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1902.). |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1109.) |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15). |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 832 | Amended Code | Citation Text |