CA AB541 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 150, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 150, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11756.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to substance abuse disorder treatment.
Title
Tobacco assessment.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Berman [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-16 - Assembly - AB 541 Berman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB541 Berman et al. By Rubio (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 541 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB541 Berman et al. By Rubio (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 541 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-31 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 150, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-08-31 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-08-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. | |
2021-08-16 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2404.). |
2021-07-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1906.). |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 16). |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and APPR. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1764.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-03-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11756.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |