CA AB518 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-06 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-06 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Section 7480 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 15630.1 of, and to amend and repeal Sections 15633, 15634, 15640, and 15655.5 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to elder and dependent adult abuse.
Title
Elder and dependent adult abuse: mandated reporters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 518 WAGNER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-05-26 | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. | |
2011-05-12 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-12 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1356.) | |
2011-05-09 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |
2011-04-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-30 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-03-24 | Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. | |
2011-03-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and PUB. S. | |
2011-02-16 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | |
2011-02-15 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7480 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15630.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15633 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15634 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15640 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15655.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |