CA AB510 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1371.9 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10112.8 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Out-of-network health care benefits.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-02-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-02-10AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
2021-02-09AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1371.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10112.8Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback