CA AB506 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 89032.5 to the Education Code, relating to the California State University.
Title
California State University: graduation requirement: ethnic studies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 506 Mike Fong Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 506 Mike Fong Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2023-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 12). |
2023-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1986.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2023-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2023-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 89032.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |