CA AB462 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 403, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1095.5 to the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to mental health services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health Services Oversight and Accountability Commission: wage information data access.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-11 - Assembly - AB 462 THURMOND Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB462 Thurmond By Beall (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 462 THURMOND Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-02 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 403, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-02 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-18AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-09-11AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3105.).
2017-09-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-06SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2499.).
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-06-29SenateOrdered to third reading.
2017-06-29SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2017-06-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-06-26SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-06-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-04-20SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-04-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1143.)
2017-04-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 5).
2017-03-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-02-27AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2017-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Unemployment Insurance Code1095Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code1095.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code5845Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback