CA AB448 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 336, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 6539.5 to the Government Code, relating to joint powers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint powers authorities: Orange County Housing Finance Trust.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-23 - Assembly - AB 448 DALY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB448 Daly et al. By Moorlach (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 448 DALY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 336, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-11 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-28AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-23AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6510.).
2018-08-20AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 20).
2018-08-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-06SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5162.).
2018-06-28SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-27SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-21SenateRe-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-06-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-05-31SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-07-11SenateIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-20SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 2. Page 1796.)
2017-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 24).
2017-05-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2017-05-10AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-04AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-02-27AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2017-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2017-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code54930Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code6539.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback