CA AB412 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Chapter 2.1 (commencing with Section 8110) of Division 1 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Commission on Human Rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-02 - Assembly - AB 412 Reyes Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB412 Reyes et al. By Becker (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 412 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08AssemblyVetoed by Governor.
2021-09-10 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2021-09-02AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 0.).
2021-09-02AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 43. Noes 12.)
2021-09-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-09-01SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 7.).
2021-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-23SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-06-22SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (June 22).
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
2021-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 20).
2021-05-20AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
2021-05-19AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-05-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-05AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-05-04AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28).
2021-02-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2021-02-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
2021-02-03AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code8110Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback