CA AB367 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 664, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 664, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 35292.6 of, and to add Section 66027.7 to, the Education Code, relating to menstrual products.
Title
Menstrual products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 367 Cristina Garcia Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB367 Cristina Garcia et a By Skinner (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB367 Cristina Garcia et a By Skinner Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB367 Cristina Garcia et a By Skinner (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 367 Cristina Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB367 Cristina Garcia et a By Skinner (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB367 Cristina Garcia et a By Skinner Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB367 Cristina Garcia et a By Skinner (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 367 Cristina Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 664, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2972.). |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 2517.). |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2517.) |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2498.). |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-07-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-06-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-06-11 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1759.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 20). |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 24). |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED. |
2021-02-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 35292.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |