CA AB333 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 699, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 699, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 186.22 of, and to add Section 1109 to, the Penal Code, relating to criminal gangs.
Title
Participation in a criminal street gang: enhanced sentence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-08 - Assembly - AB 333 Kamlager Concurrence in Senate Amendments By WEBER, A (Y: 41 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB333 Kamlager (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - AB 333 Kamlager Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 27 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - AB 333 Kamlager Assembly Third Reading By GRAY (Y: 38 N: 27 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB333 Kamlager (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - AB 333 Kamlager Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 27 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - AB 333 Kamlager Assembly Third Reading By GRAY (Y: 38 N: 27 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 699, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 41. Noes 30. Page 2927.). |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 2703.) |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 2284.). |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 6). |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 27. Page 1905.) |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1688.) |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. (Page 1688.) |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Gray. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 38. Noes 27. Page 1434.). |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 6). |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 27. |
2021-01-27 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1109 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 186.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |