CA AB3321 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-06 - Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-06 - Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11902, 11902.5, 11905, and 11907 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to pest control operations.
Title
Pest control operations: aircraft operations: certificates.
Sponsors
Asm. Vince Fong [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 11902 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 11902.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 11905 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 11907 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3321 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3321 |