CA AB327 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-17 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-17 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 667, 667.1, 1170.12, and 1170.125 of the Penal Code, relating to sentencing.
Title
Sentencing: Three Strikes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-31 - Assembly - AB 327 DAVIS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Assembly - AB 327 DAVIS Motion to Reconsider (Y: 44 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Assembly - AB 327 DAVIS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2012-01-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Assembly - AB 327 DAVIS Motion to Reconsider (Y: 44 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Assembly - AB 327 DAVIS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2012-01-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-17 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-03-26 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-02-16 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-01-31 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-01-31 | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 44. Noes 26. Page 3648.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 34. Page 3649.) | |
2012-01-30 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 33. Noes 35. Page 3634.). Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Davis. Motion to immediately take up the motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Hagman. (Ayes 28. Noes 45. Page 3635.) Motion fails. Ordered to the unfinished business file. | |
2012-01-26 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 3593.) | |
2012-01-23 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-01-19 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 8.) (January 19). | |
2012-01-10 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-01-04 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-02-11 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | |
2011-02-10 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25210.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1170.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1170.125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 667 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 667.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |