CA AB3222 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to claims against the state, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Claims against the state: appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3222 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3222 |