CA AB3136 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to Com. on L. & E.
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to Com. on L. & E.
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2750.3 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Worker status: independent contractors: certified shorthand reporters.
Sponsors
Asm. Randy Voepel [R] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Asm. William Brough [R] | Asm. Steven Choi [R] |
Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 2750.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3136 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3136 |