CA AB3053 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Jun 3 @ 4:00 pm in State Capitol, Assembly Chamber
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 90.5 of, and to add Section 217.5 to, the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor Commissioner: unpaid wage claim process.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2020-05-05AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
2020-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2020-05-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
2020-04-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2020-02-24AssemblyRead first time.
2020-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2020-02-21AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code217.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code90.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback