CA AB3045 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12805 of the Government Code, and to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 191) to Chapter 2 of Division 1 of the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Natural Resources Agency: State Water Project Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 191 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 6021 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 6025 | Amended Code | Citation Text |