CA AB303 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 161, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 161, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 30010 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: prohibited persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-08-24 - Assembly - AB 303 Davies Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-08-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB303 Davies (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 303 Davies Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB303 Davies (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 303 Davies Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 161, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-09-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:15 p.m. | |
2023-08-24 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2783.). |
2023-08-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-08-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2139.). |
2023-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1966.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (February 28). |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-01-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 30010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |